Dindzans, Vincents Janis (CPSO#: 50439)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Latvian

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993