Dinning, Stephen Ian (CPSO#: 90461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN IAN DINNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2011 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015