Dinovitzer, Natalie Marie (CPSO#: 70142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenboro Family Medicine Centre
Suite 200
25 Tapiola Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7
Phone: (613) 738-0303
Fax: (613) 738-8950
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE MARIE DINOVITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINOVITZER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1997 to 15 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998