Diodati, David Stanley (CPSO#: 95388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N0H 2T0
Phone: (519) 534-5220
Fax: (519) 534-1024
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diodati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Diodati ( CPSO# 95388 )

Business Address:
369 Mary Street
Wiarton ON  N1H 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 534-5220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STANLEY DIODATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIODATI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013