Dion, Francoise Marie (CPSO#: 53481)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991