Dion, Jacques Joseph Edgar (CPSO#: 53328)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1992