Dion, Peter Wilson (CPSO#: 50440)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 6, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Wilson Dion to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2015:

Dr. Dion was the subject of a College investigation into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. While the investigation was ongoing, Dr. Dion retired from practice and voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for the full Undertaking
Download Full Document (PDF)