Dionne, Claire (CPSO#: 60006)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2004