Dionne, George Paul (CPSO#: 28539)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1995