Dionne, Matthew Louis (CPSO#: 69024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1980 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dionne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dionne ( CPSO# 67995 )
Dr. M. Dionne ( CPSO# 69024 )

Business Address:
119 Langstaff Drive
Carp ON  K0A 1L0
Phone Number: (613) 839-3271

Business Address:
College Square
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW LOUIS DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2006