Dionne, Michel Andre (CPSO#: 80104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Department of Palliative Medicine
43 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 4008
Fax: 613-562-6371
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8940
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michel Dionne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dionne ( CPSO# 80104 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room AB 169
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room 7459
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8940

Business Address:
Bruyere Continuing Care
Department of Palliative Medicine
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 552-0269

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL ANDRE DIONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIONNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2012 to 04 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2006