Diosy, David Christopher (CPSO#: 69111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
Dept EEG and Epilepsy, 10th Floor
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3248
Fax: (519) 663-3152
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrianna Ranger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Diosy ( CPSO# 69111 )
Dr. A. Ranger ( CPSO# 66604 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatric Neurosurgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8107


Corporation Name: David C. Diosy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Diosy ( CPSO# 69111 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3248

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHRISTOPHER DIOSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIOSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000