Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dipchand, Anne Indira (CPSO#: 65345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6674
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kempenaar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kempenaar ( CPSO# 65248 )
Dr. A. Dipchand ( CPSO# 65345 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax/ Pickering ER Department
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (416) 277-2097

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE INDIRA DIPCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIPCHAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Research Fellows - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993