Dirnberger, Walter (CPSO#: 15334)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Graz, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1955
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Oct 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Oct 1994