Disney, Lew Bradley (CPSO#: 50441)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Building 9 255 East Bonita Avenue Pomona CA 91711 United States
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2016