Disperati, Patricia (CPSO#: 80901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Catolica do Parana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-3325
Fax: (416) 469-6420
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Disperati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Disperati ( CPSO# 80901 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
K2 Wing
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 573-1937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 28 Feb 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA DISPERATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DISPERATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 16 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2010