Dittmer, Rizelle (CPSO#: 79883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc., 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 1.888.781.9083 or fax 1.866.297.9338
Instructions: contact above
Date Received: 06 Feb 2014


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 17 Jul 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Feb 2014