Divaris, Dimitrios Xenophon Georgeou (CPSO#: 53675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department Of Laboratories
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2323
Fax: (519) 744-4221
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6793
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitrios Divaris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Divaris ( CPSO# 53675 )

Business Address:
620 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2L7

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Laboratories
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 3B4

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS XENOPHON GEORGEOU DIVARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIVARIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1989