Diwan, Murtaza Adamali (CPSO#: 60354)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Diwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Diwan ( CPSO# 60354 )

Business Address:
21 Queensway
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6

Medical Records Location

Address: Tel for 21 Queensway W: (905) 897-0788 Docudavit Solutions Inc. Tel: (416) 781-9083
Instructions: Patients seen at the walk-in clinic at 21 Queensway West can call the clinic for their medical records. Patients seen at 85 Norfolk Street should contact Docudavit Medical Solutions
Date Received: 13 Sep 2017


Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. Tel: 416-781-9083
Date Received: 20 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)