Dix, David Bryan (CPSO#: 71703)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2002