Dixit, Sanjay (CPSO#: 79791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 34
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 332-9292
Fax: (905) 332-9244
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Sanjay Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dixit ( CPSO# 79791 )

Business Address:
Suite 34
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 332-9292

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 18 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009