Dixon, Heather Lynn (CPSO#: 71071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
I H B
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dixon ( CPSO# 71071 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1999