Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dixon, Peter Frederick (CPSO#: 56336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 6222
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dixon ( CPSO# 56336 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
202 - 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER FREDERICK DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001