Djordjevic, Bojana (CPSO#: 79627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomic Pathology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bojana Djordjevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Djordjevic ( CPSO# 79627 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Departmnet of Anatomic Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite E4-27B
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOJANA DJORDJEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJORDJEVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010