Dlacic, Aleksandra (CPSO#: 81821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6203
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA DLACIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DLACIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 04 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008