Dmytrash, Andrea Leanne (CPSO#: 99097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
P.O. Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA LEANNE DMYTRASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMYTRASH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016