Doan, John David (CPSO#: 98291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V5S3
Phone: 705-327-3330
Fax: 705-327-7675
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Bag 4000
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T1K2
Canada
Phone: 807-737-5161
Fax: 807-737-4364
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Doan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doan ( CPSO# 98291 )

Business Address:
100 Colborne Street West
Suite 200
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone Number: (705) 327-3330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID DOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014