Dobbin, James Patrick (CPSO#: 65172)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 30 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1999
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 04 Jul 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Sep 2002

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Sep 2002
Summary:

 On September 30, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Dobbin to be guilty of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient and found that he engaged in an act or omission 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee 
 ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. Dobbin be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.
2)	The Certificate of Registration in the name of Dr. Dobbin be revoked 
 
3)	Dr. Dobbin pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 30, 2002


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Jul 2001
Summary:

 On July 4, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Dobbin(s plea of guilty (through his 
 counsel) and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to sexually abusing a 
 patient as well as unacceptable conduct.

The Committee ordered a reprimand, the fact of the 
 reprimand to be noted on the Register as well as revocation of his certificate of registration.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 04, 2001