Dobell, Julie Ann (CPSO#: 53403)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1990