Dobenko, Sheryl Noreen (CPSO#: 52833)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: Keely-Dobenko, Sheryl Noreen (used until: 21 Feb 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone: (613) 599-3422
Fax: (613) 599-6922
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dobenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dobenko ( CPSO# 52833 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-3422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL NOREEN DOBENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBENKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985