Dobosz, Katherine (CPSO#: 94518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone: (519) 966-2473
Fax: (519) 966-8961
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Dobosz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dobosz ( CPSO# 94518 )

Business Address:
5881 Malden Road
La Salle ON  N9H 1S5
Phone Number: (519) 966-3411

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE DOBOSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBOSZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013