Dobrovolskis, Paul Stephan (CPSO#: 59366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Duggal ( CPSO# 78042 )
Dr. P. Dobrovolskis ( CPSO# 59366 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Paul Dobrovolskis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dobrovolskis ( CPSO# 59366 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHAN DOBROVOLSKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBROVOLSKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2002