Dobrowolski, Stanley Thomas (CPSO#: 32774)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 30 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Divisional Court Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2015

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Nov 2015
Summary:

 On November 30, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dobrowolski committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of patients, has engaged in conduct or 
 an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, has failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession; and has been found guilty of offences relevant to his 
 suitability to practise. Dr. Dobrowolski did not contest the allegations. 
    
 On December 20, 2005, as a result of an appeal of a decision of the Discipline Committee of the College 
 of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the Divisional Court made an order, by which terms, conditions or 
 limitations were imposed on Dr. Dobrowolski’s certificate of registration. These terms, conditions or 
 limitations were in place until October 12, 2012 at 12:01 a.m. when his certificate of registration was 
 suspended on an interim basis by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) of the 
College, pending this hearing. The terms, conditions or limitations imposed by the Divisional Court 
included that: 
(a) Dr. Dobrowolski was prohibited from performing any form of physical examination on any of his 
    patients; 
(b) Dr. Dobrowolski was required to post signage in his waiting room in a location where it was visible 
   to patients, in an approved form, advising patients of this restriction; 
(c) Dr. Dobrowolski was required to advise all female patients of the discipline findings made against 
    him by the Discipline Committee of the College, and that as a result he was restricted from 
    performing any form of physical examinations on any of his patients, and that if a physical 
    examination was necessary, it would have to be performed by another physician; 
 (d) Dr. Dobrowolski was required to further advise all female patients that it was inappropriate and 
    unacceptable for him to have any form of relationship with his patients outside of the physician-
    patient therapy relationship; and 
 (e) Dr. Dobrowolski was required to have all existing and future female patients sign an acknowledgment 
    in a form provided, indicating that they had been advised of all of this information.   
        
 Investigation regarding Patient A 
 Patient A was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient between approximately February 2006 and May 2011, having 
 been referred to him by a friend when seeking treatment for panic attacks and anxiety.   
        
 With respect to Patient A, in summary between February 2006 and May 2011, during the doctor-patient 
 relationship: 
    -  Dr. Dobrowolski touched Patient A in a sexual manner, including her breasts, legs, vaginal area 
       and anal area, in the guise of a medical examination; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski shaved Patient A’s legs and pubic area during medical appointments for a 
      sexual purpose; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski took photographs and videos of Patient A during medical appointments, on 
      some occasions without her knowledge, including photographs and videos in which she was fully 
      or partially nude and was being touched by Dr. Dobrowolski; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski purchased lingerie for Patient A to wear and photographed her wearing it during 
      medical appointments; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski inappropriately showed photographs of other patients’ genital areas to Patient A 
      during medical appointments; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski hugged and kissed Patient A during medical appointments; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski offered to undress during Patient A’s medical appointment;  
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski made inappropriate and sexual remarks to Patient A during medical 
      appointments; 
   -  Dr. Dobrowolski gave and lent money and items to Patient A during medical appointments; 
                                         
  
    - Dr. Dobrowolski breached the terms, conditions or limitations of his certificate of registration and 
      the Divisional Court order in his conduct towards Patient A. 
  
 During the entire time period that he treated Patient A, Dr. Dobrowolski was subject to the terms, 
 conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration and the Divisional Court order.  He violated 
 these terms, conditions or limitations and the Divisional Court order by conducting what purported to be 
 physical examinations of Patient A.  In addition, although he had Patient A sign the acknowledgement 
 required by the Divisional Court’s order, Dr. Dobrowolski gave Patient A false and misleading 
 information about the terms on his certificate of registration, and the reasons for them, including his 
 discipline history. 
  
 In July 2012, as a result of information received from Patient A and her husband, College investigators 
 attended at Dr. Dobrowolski’s office to obtain any computers used in his practice, together with thumb 
 drives, disc drives, storage units, and cameras for inspection and analysis.  
       
The College retained a computer forensics expert, Mr. X, to perform a forensic analysis of the materials 
obtained from Dr. Dobrowolski’s office. Preliminary results of his analysis showed numerous images of 
Patient A from Dr. Dobrowolski’s computer that Mr. X had recovered, including nude and partially nude 
images. The images were derived from videos taken on a computer camera, from which screen shots were 
taken and saved by Dr. Dobrowolski. Though Patient A believed Dr. Dobrowolski was performing 
physical examinations on her, in fact he had been touching her for a sexual purpose and filming himself 
doing so.   
 
In addition, Mr. X recovered thousands of images of other nude and partially nude women. The images 
were captured in Dr. Dobrowolski’s medical office, in some cases while the women interacted with Dr. 
Dobrowolski, for example while he handled their breasts, and in some cases without the woman’s face 
being visible. Mr. X also recovered two videos of women in their underwear and/or nude, taken in Dr. 
Dobrowolski’s medical office, in which Dr. Dobrowolski touched the women, including their breasts and 
vaginal areas.  Both videos and many images had been deleted prior to Mr. X’s analysis. 
 
Upon the College’s receipt of the preliminary results of the computer forensics analysis, on October 10, 
2012, the ICRC referred allegations to the Discipline Committee and suspended Dr. Dobrowolski’s 
certificate of registration without notice. At the same time, another investigation was commenced by the 
College, based on the information obtained in the investigation into Mr. A’s complaint, including in 
particular the videos and images of women other than Patient A that were obtained from Dr. 
Dobrowolski’s computer devices. 
 
Criminal Conviction of Dr. Dobrowolski 
After allegations against Dr. Dobrowolski were referred to discipline, Dr. Dobrowolski was arrested in 
November 2012, and charged with sexual assault of Patient A.  
 
On May 14, 2014, Dr. Dobrowolski was found guilty in the Ontario Court of Justice of the following 
offences relevant to his suitability to practise: 
(i)  having sexually assaulted sixteen persons, contrary to section 271, subsection (1) of the Criminal 
     Code of Canada ( “sexual assault”); 
(ii) having without lawful excuse disobeyed a lawful order by conducting physical examinations on 
     twelve persons, contrary to section 127, subsection (1) of the Criminal Code of Canada (“breach of 
     a court order”); and 
(iii) having without lawful excuse, surreptitiously made visual recordings of nine persons, who were in 
     circumstances that gave rise to a reasonable expectation of privacy when those persons were in a 
     place in which they could reasonably be expected to be nude, to be exposing their genital organs or 
                                         
  
     anal region or exposing their breasts or be engaged in explicit sexual activity, namely Dr. 
     Dobrowolski’s office, and thereby having committed an offence under section 162, subsection (1), 
     clause (a) of the Criminal Code, contrary to section 162, subsection (5) of the Criminal Code of 
     Canada (“voyeurism”).   
 
In total, the criminal findings related to Dr. Dobrowolski’s conduct towards 22 female patients, including 
Patient A.  
 
Misconduct towards Other Patients 
The College’s and police investigative processes led to the discovery of misconduct by Dr. Dobrowolski 
towards other patients who were not the subject of his criminal conviction: 
(i)  Regarding Patient B, when College investigators attended at Dr. Dobrowolski’s office in October 
     2012 to serve him with notice of his suspension and of the new investigation, she was present at his 
     office. Investigators identified her as the subject of one of the videos recovered in the forensic 
     analysis. The video shows Dr. Dobrowolski placing a concealed video camera in the area of his 
     desk before Patient B enters the room. It then shows Dr. Dobrowolski touching Patient B’s breasts 
     and vaginal area, including inserting his fingers into her vagina. College investigators advised 
     Patient B of the video that the College had discovered. They learned from her that on numerous 
     occasions during medical appointments Dr. Dobrowolski had conducted what Patient B believed at 
     the time to be physical examinations on her, consisting of Dr. Dobrowolski touching her breasts and 
     her genitals, including inside her vagina. Dr. Dobrowolski had videotaped Patient B without her 
     knowledge, while touching her breasts and her genitals for his own sexual purposes. 
(ii) Regarding Patient C, in approximately 2011 or 2012, Dr. Dobrowolski purported to examine a mole 
     at a medical appointment. She removed her top but not her bra for the examination. In doing so, Dr. 
     Dobrowolski breached the terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration and the 
     Divisional Court order prohibiting him from conducting physical examinations, and engaged in 
     inappropriate touching of a sexual nature. 
(iii) Regarding Patient D, she was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient intermittently between 2000 and 2011.  Dr. 
     Dobrowolski on one occasion early in her treatment performed what purported to be a physical 
     examination, including feeling around the area of her breast, while telling her that he had found 
     cancerous spots on other women.  In doing so, Dr. Dobrowolski engaged in inappropriate touching 
     of a sexual nature. 
(iv) Regarding Patient E, she was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient from November 2005 to March 2006.  Dr. 
     Dobrowolski offered to check her breasts to see if she had any moles, and performed what 
     purported to be a breast examination on one occasion during a medical appointment.  In doing so, 
     Dr. Dobrowolski engaged in inappropriate touching of a sexual nature. 
(v)  Regarding Patient F, on approximately five occasions between 2007 and 2008 during medical 
     appointments, Dr. Dobrowolski conducted what purported to be physical examinations, with Patient 
     F’s bra off and her underwear on. In doing so, Dr. Dobrowolski engaged in inappropriate touching 
     of a sexual nature and breached the terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration 
     and the Divisional Court order.  
(vi) Regarding Patient G, she was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient between February 2005 and May 2012.  
     Dr. Dobrowolski injected vitamin B12 shots into Patient G’s buttocks on 1 to 3 occasions during 
     medical appointments, in breach of the terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate of 
     registration and the Divisional Court order.  He also inappropriately lent her one hundred dollars 
     during a medical appointment. 
(vii) Regarding Patient H, Dr. Dobrowolski injected vitamin B12 shots into her hip once a month 
     between 2005 and 2007. While Dr. Dobrowolski had Patient H sign the acknowledgement required 
     by the terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration and the Divisional Court 
     order, he falsely told her they arose because a patient’s husband had overreacted when Dr. 
     Dobrowolski examined his wife for a mole while she was breastfeeding.    
                                         
  
 (viii) Regarding Patient I, she was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient in approximately 2005 and 2006. Dr. 
     Dobrowolski directed Patient I to disrobe, did not leave the room while she did so, and performed 
     what purported to be physical examinations on her, including touching her legs, abdomen, and 
     breasts. In doing so, he engaged in touching of Patient I of a sexual nature and breached the terms, 
     conditions or limitations on his certificate of registration and the Divisional Court order. 
 (ix) Regarding Patient J, she was Dr. Dobrowolski’s patient from approximately 1998 until June 2012. 
     Dr. Dobrowolski made inappropriate comments to Patient J during medical appointments, including 
     sharing personal information.  Dr. Dobrowolski also commenced performing a physical 
     examination on Patient J on one occasion during a medical appointment, inappropriately looking at 
     and touching her back and chest, purportedly while looking for moles.  Patient J did not remove her 
     clothes. Dr. Dobrowolski inappropriately offered to perform a breast examination during a medical 
     appointment, but Patient J declined.  
  
 The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Dobrowolski’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.  
- Dr. Dobrowolski appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Dobrowolski reimburse the College for funding provided to those patients in respect of whom this 
panel has found Dr. Dobrowolski to have engaged in sexual abuse, under the program required under 
section 85.7 of the Code. 
- Dr. Dobrowolski post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, to 
guarantee the payment of any amounts he may be required to reimburse under paragraph 4 of this Order, 
such security to be posted within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $449,680.00. 
 - Dr. Dobrowoski pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 within thirty (30) days of the date 
 of this Order. 
  

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 30, 2015


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Jul 2004
Summary:

On November 29, 2004, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, found that Dr. Stanley 
Thomas Dobrowolski committed professional misconduct pursuant to the Health Professions Procedural Code and made its 
penalty order. 
 
On December 17, 2004, Dr. Dobrowolski appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice 
(Divisional Court).    Pursuant to s.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the appeal stayed the decision of the 
Discipline Committee. 
 
On December 20, 2005, the Divisional Court allowed the appeal on consent of the parties, set aside the Order of the Discipline 
Committee and imposed the following penalty: 
 
   (i)   The Appellant shall attend before a new panel of the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded with the fact of 
         the reprimand to be recorded on the register; 
   (ii)  The Registrar shall suspend the Appellant s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months.    Three (3) 
         months of the suspension shall be suspended if the Appellant attends at his own expense and successfully 
         complete the College boundary and record-keeping courses.    The suspension shall commence on June 1, 2006. 
   (iii) The Appellant shall no longer conduct any form of physical examination of any of his patients; 
   (iv)  The Appellant shall place in his waiting room in a location where it will be visible to patients the notice attached 
         as Schedule A [to the Divisional Court order]; 
   (v)   The Appellant shall advise all female patients of the discipline findings made against him by the Discipline 
         Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons, and that as a result he is restricted from performing any 
         form of physical examinations on any of his patients, and that if a physical examination is necessary it will have 
         to be performed by another physician; 
   (vi)  The Appellant shall further advise all female patients that it is inappropriate and unacceptable for him to have 
         any form of relationship with his patients outside of the physician-patient therapy relationship. 
   (vii) The Appellant shall have all existing and future female patients, when they arrive for their next appointment 
         after the date of this Order, sign an acknowledgement in the form attached as Schedule B  [to the Divisional 
         Court order], and permanently retain the acknowledgement in all patient medical records, such records to be 
         stored in his office and made available for inspection by the College of Physicians and Surgeons; 
   (viii) The Appellant shall permanently maintain a master list containing the names of all patients; 
   (ix)  The Appellant shall allow representatives of the College of Physicians and Surgeons to attend at his office 
         without prior notice for periodic random inspections of patient charts; 
   (x)   The Appellant shall provide his written consent to the College of Physicians and Surgeons having access to his 
         billings to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
   (xi)  A restriction shall be placed on the Appellant s certificate of registration prohibiting him from conducting any 
         form of physical examination on any of his patients; 
   (xii) All of the conditions and restrictions imposed on the Appellant shall be placed on his certificate of registration in 
         the public register. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 20 Dec 2005
Hearing Date(s): Jul 06, 2004


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Oct 1999
Summary:

 On October 7, 1999 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Dobrowolsi(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Subsequently, the Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Dobrowolski is to be reprimanded and the fact of that reprimand is to be recorded 
 on the Register;

2.	During the 5-month period immediately following the disposition of this 
 hearing, Dr. Dobrowolski shall submit himself to supervision of his practice, at his expense.  
 This supervision should include, but shall not be limited to, the use of tapes and video tapes of 
 patient interviews, chart reviews, and attention to issues of transference, counter-transference 
 and boundary violations.  The supervisor shall submit a report to the Registrar following the 
 5-month period, confirming that supervision of Dr. Dobrowolski(s practice has been carried out in 
 accordance with the foregoing and that Dr. Dobrowolski(s psychiatric care is appropriate and 
 ethical;

3.	Dr. Dobrowolski shall submit to a peer assessment by the supervisor 12 months after 
 completion of the 5-month period of supervision, and the supervisor shall submit a report on his 
 assessment to the Registrar;

4.	Dr. Dobrowolski shall provide written apologies to the 
 complainants to be sent to the College for forwarding to the complaints; and

5.	A questionnaire 
 is to be made available to patients at Dr. Dobrowolski(s office for the period of 12 months from 
 the date of disposition.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 07, 1999


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 1995
Summary:

Between July and October 1994, Dr. Dobrowolski had been referred to the Discipline Committee on various allegations of 
professional misconduct and incompetence.    The Executive Committee ordered that these allegations be divided into two 
sets and dealt with in two separate Discipline Hearings.    In the course of one of these Hearings, which began in October 
1994, Dr. Dobrowolski pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as 
amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in 
conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).    The Discipline Committee 
accepted this plea, and in a decision which was released in April 1995, found him guilty of professional misconduct.    At the 
same time, the Committee also found Dr. Dobrowolski guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(3) of Ontario 
Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records which are required to be kept respecting his patients. 
 Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Dobrowolski was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Dobrowolski s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of twelve months. 
 
   3. The latter nine months of the twelve-month period of suspension were to be suspended, provided that the following 
      conditions were met: 
 
      (a) Through the twelve-month period Dr. Dobrowolski was to continue to see his treating psychiatrist at least 
          once a month. 
 
      (b) The treating psychiatrist was to submit reports, satisfactory to the Registrar, every two months, confirming that 
          Dr. Dobrowolski was continuing in his course of treatment, that he was making satisfactory progress and that 
          he was unlikely to pose any threat to the well-being of his patients.    The first such report was to be received 
          by the Registrar no more than 75 days after this Order became final and subsequent reports were to be 
          received every 60 days thereafter. 
 
      (c) During the ten-month period immediately following the resumption of his practice, Dr. Dobrowolski was to 
          submit himself to nine months of weekly supervision of his practice, at his expense, with a supervisor or his or 
          her alternate, both acceptable to the Registrar.    The supervision was to include, but was not to be limited to, 
          the use of tapes and videotapes of patient interviews, chart reviews, and attention to issues of transference, 
          counter-transference and boundary violations.    The proposed supervisor was, no later than 75 days after 
          this Order became final, to confirm in writing to the Registrar that he or she would undertake the supervision 
          of Dr. Dobrowolski s practice. 
 
      (d) The supervisor was to submit reports, satisfactory to the Registrar, every two months, confirming that 
          supervision of Dr. Dobrowolski s practice was being carried out in accordance with the foregoing terms and 
          that Dr. Dobrowolski s pyschiatric care was appropriate and ethical.    The first such report was to be received 
          by the Registrar no more than 165 days after this Order became final and subsequent reports were to be 
          received every 60 days thereafter. 
 
4. In the event that the Registrar failed to receive the reports required under paragraphs 3(b) and 3(d) cited above, the 
   suspension of Dr. Dobrowolski s licence to practice was to resume and to continue for the remaining nine months. 
              
5. By agreement of counsel, in light of the Section 37 Order against Dr. Dobrowolski, the time that he had been unable 
   to practice was to be credited against the suspension imposed by the Discipline Committee, provided that the terms 
   imposed under paragraphs 3(a) through 3(d) cited above were to apply forthwith upon his resuming his practice, for 
   the time periods therein specified.             

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 31, 1994