Dobson, Gary Michael (CPSO#: 53482)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2008