Dobson, Gregory Robert (CPSO#: 57377)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998