Dobson, Jessica Lynn (CPSO#: 97840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
28 Huron Street, Unit 102
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone: (705) 443-8100
Fax: (705) 443-4311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Dobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dobson ( CPSO# 97840 )

Business Address:
28 Huron Street
Suite 102
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone Number: (705) 443-8100

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
456 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNN DOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014