Dobson, William Mckenzie (CPSO#: 43414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Trafalgar Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William M. Dobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Dobson ( CPSO# 43414 )

Business Address:
Trafalgar Medical Clinic
200 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 844-3281

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MCKENZIE DOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985