Docherty, Denis Francis (CPSO#: 41029)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1959
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Apr 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Nov 1991