Docherty, Peter Scott (CPSO#: 57138)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991