Dockrill, Mark Beresford (CPSO#: 77745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N6
Phone: (613) 634-0373
Fax: (613) 634-0379
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark B. Dockrill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dockrill ( CPSO# 77745 )

Business Address:
805 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N6
Phone Number: (613) 634-0373

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK BERESFORD DOCKRILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCKRILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2005