Doctor, Joel Allan (CPSO#: 61253)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Names: Allan, Joel (used until: 17 Jan 1991 )     Doctor, Joel Allan (used until: 27 Mar 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Oct 1996