Doctor, Shaheen Saifuddin (CPSO#: 68918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6444 Ext. 4477
Fax: (416) 756-6817
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Doctor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Doctor ( CPSO# 68918 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHEEN SAIFUDDIN DOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2000