Doctor, Shamoon Abbas (CPSO#: 26440)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Osmania University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 3209 Lazy Lake Drive Harlingen TX 78550 United States
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018