Dodd, Andrew Evan (CPSO#: 97306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2012 to 10 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016