Dodd, Christopher Alexander (CPSO#: 78532)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sheffield, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2009