Dodds, Mark Cameron (CPSO#: 94496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brighton Quinte West FHT
80 Catherine St.
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone: (613) 394-0770
Fax: 613-3947079
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark C. Dodds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dodds ( CPSO# 94496 )

Business Address:
Brighton Quinte West FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6N8
Phone Number: (613) 394-0770

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Missouri

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Mark  Cameron  Dodds  may  practise medicine independently in Family
            Medicine, only.