Dodds, Michael Kenneth (CPSO#: 104663)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 16 Oct 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016