Dodick, David William (CPSO#: 69536)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2006