Dodig, Dubravka M (CPSO#: 83993)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, French, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
360 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S6
Phone: (416) 728-2756
Fax: (416) 792-0276
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavilion, 4th Floor, Room 435
399 Bathrurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416 603-5922
Fax: 416 603-7096
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
ETOBICOKE GENERAL HOSPITAL
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1R8
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3469
Fax: (416) 747-3344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
BRAMPTON CIVIC HOSPITAL
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57607
Fax: (905) 494-6475
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dodig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dodig ( CPSO# 83993 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3469

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
4th Floor Fell Pavilion
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUBRAVKA M DODIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DODIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2006 to 12 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008