Doell, Brian (CPSO#: 74274)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Doell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1999 to 07 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015